Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XII

Angelo Correr {Corrario}

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1327BornVenice
15 Oct 138053.8AppointedBishop of Castello, Italy
21 Nov 139063.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
12 Jun 140578.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 140578.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
30 Nov 140679.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Dec 140680.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Jul 141588.5ResignedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Jul 141588.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
18 Oct 141790.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Correr {Corrario}:
Holy Father Angelo Correr {Corrario} (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 1.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.5 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013