Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent IX

Giovanni Antonio Facchinetti de Nuce

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1519BornBologna
11 Mar 154424.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jan 156040.5AppointedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
6 May 156646.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
15 Jun 157252.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
23 Sep 157556.1ResignedBishop of Nicastro, Italy
12 Nov 157657.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
12 Dec 158364.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jan 158464.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
29 Oct 159172.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Nov 159172.2InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Dec 159172.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Facchinetti de Nuce (VIAF: 33091014)
Pope Giovanni Antonio Facchinetti de Nuce (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 210, and Page 256
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016