Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict VIII

Teofilatto

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
980¹Born
1001²21.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto
1001²21.0Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 100121.4Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Porto
18 May 101232.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Apr 102444.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teofilatto (VIAF: 70918274)
Pope Teofilatto (born 980, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 11.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1001

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Mar 2017