Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John XXII

Jacques d’Euse

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1244BornCahors, France
4 Feb 130056.0AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
18 Mar 131066.2AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
23 Dec 131268.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Vitale
23 Dec 131268.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 May 131369.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
7 Aug 131672.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
5 Sep 131672.6InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
4 Dec 133490.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Jacques d’Euse:
Pope Jacques d’Euse (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 3.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 18.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014