Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XVI

Bartolomeo Alberto (Mauro) Cappellari, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1765BornBelluno
1786²20.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1787²21.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
21 Mar 182559.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Mar 182660.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 182660.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
1 Oct 182661.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
2 Feb 183165.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Feb 183165.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Jun 184680.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Alberto (Mauro) Cappellari (VIAF: 79049872)
Pope Bartolomeo Alberto (Mauro) Cappellari O.S.B. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1831, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Mar 1825

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016