Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Callistus III

Alfonso de Borja y Cabanilles

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})

Bishop of Valencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1378BornTorreta de Canals
20 Aug 142950.6AppointedBishop of Valencia, Spain
31 Aug 142950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valencia, Spain
2 May 144465.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jul 144465.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
8 Apr 145576.2ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Apr 145576.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Aug 145879.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Alfonso de Borja y Cabanilles:
Pope Alfonso de Borja y Cabanilles (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,365
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Number 9,695
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,711
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 May 1444
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 306, Number 180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014