Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Urban III

Uberto Crivelli

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1120¹BornCuggiono
Sep 1173³53.6AppointedCardinal-Priest
Sep 1173³53.6Elevated to Cardinal
Aug 1182³62.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
Dec 1182²62.9AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
9 May 118565.3AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
25 Nov 118565.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 Dec 118565.9InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
20 Oct 118767.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Uberto Crivelli:
Pope Uberto Crivelli (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 12.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Sep 1173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014