Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Sixtus IV

Francesco della Rovere, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1414BornPecorile, Cella Ligure
18 Sep 146753.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 146753.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Aug 147157.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Aug 147157.0Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Aug 148470.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Francesco della Rovere:
Pope Francesco della Rovere O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,881

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014