Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Benedict XI

Bl. Niccolò Boccasini, O.P. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1240BornTreviso
4 Dec 129858.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
4 Dec 129858.9Elevated to Cardinal
2 Mar 130060.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
22 Oct 130363.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Oct 130363.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Jul 130464.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Apr 1736Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Niccolò Boccasini:
Pope Bl. Niccolò Boccasini O.P. (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 4.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Dec 1298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014