Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory VIII

Alberto de Morra

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1105¹BornBenevento
Dec 1155³50.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
Dec 1155³50.9Elevated to Cardinal
1158²53.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
21 Oct 118782.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Oct 118782.8Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
17 Dec 118783.0DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alberto de Morra:
Holy Father Alberto de Morra (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for .1 years
  • a cardinal for 31.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Dec 1155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013