Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Boniface VIII

Benedetto Caetani

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1230BornAnagni
12 Apr 128151.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
12 Apr 128151.2Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 129161.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
24 Dec 129464.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Jan 129565.0Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
11 Oct 130373.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Caetani:
Pope Benedetto Caetani (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 8.7 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Apr 1281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014