Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent XII

Antonio Pignatelli del Rastrello

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1615BornSpinazzola
14 Oct 165237.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
27 Oct 165237.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
2 Nov 165237.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
19 Apr 166045.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
29 May 166045.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
9 Mar 166852.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
May 1668³53.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
2 Mar 167155.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
4 May 167156.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Lecce, Italy
Jun 1673³58.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
1675¹59.8ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
1 Sep 168166.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168166.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pancrazio
12 Jan 168266.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Faenza, Italy
30 Sep 168671.5AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Jul 169176.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
15 Jul 169176.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Sep 170085.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pignatelli del Rastrello (VIAF: 27218139)
Pope Antonio Pignatelli del Rastrello (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 47.9 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 216
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 29
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 256

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016