Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Sixtus V

Felice Peretti Montalto, O.F.M. Conv. †


Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


13 Dec 1521Born
1533²11.0EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1536²14.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1540¹18.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1547²25.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1566²44.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Nov 156644.9AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
12 Jan 156745.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
1568²46.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
17 May 157048.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157048.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
17 Dec 157150.0AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
14 Aug 157755.6ResignedBishop of Fermo, Italy
24 Apr 158563.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
1 May 158563.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Aug 159068.7DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Felice Peretti Montalto (VIAF: 7525513)
Pope Felice Peretti Montalto O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

Birth PlaceGrottamare
Ordained PriestSiena
Ordained BishopS.Sacrement, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Presepe Chapel, Saint Mary Major, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 2


Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches


About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018