Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Paul III

Alessandro Farnese

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Feb 1468Born
20 Sep 149325.5Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 149325.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
1499²30.8AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
29 Nov 150335.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
18 Feb 150839.9AppointedAdministrator of Vence, France
Oct 150840.5AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
28 Mar 150941.0AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
5 Jun 151042.2ResignedAdministrator of Vence, France
25 Sep 151345.5ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
15 Jun 151951.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
26 Jun 151951.3Ordained PriestPriest of Parma, Italy
2 Jul 151951.3Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
9 Dec 152355.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
18 Dec 152355.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
20 May 152456.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
15 Jun 152456.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
24 Jan 153061.9AppointedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
17 Apr 153264.1AppointedAdministrator of Sovana (Soana), Italy
26 Apr 153264.1ResignedAdministrator of Sovana (Soana), Italy
17 May 153264.2ResignedAdministrator of Bitonto, Italy
13 Oct 153466.6ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Nov 153466.6InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
10 Nov 154981.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Farnese (VIAF: 51803934)
Pope Alessandro Farnese (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanino

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
  • a cardinal for 41.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,626
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Sep 1493
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 248, and Page 138
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328, and Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 25 May 2018

Quantcast