Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Popes

by Birth Date


(Click on the column title to sort by that column)
#Papal
Name
Birth
Date
Conclave
Start
ElectedInstalledEnd of ReignLength
DateAgeDateAgeDateAgeElectedInstalled
266Francis17 Dec 193612 Mar 201313 Mar 201376.219 Mar 201376.2( Age: )
265Benedict XVI16 Apr 192718 Apr 200519 Apr 200578.024 Apr 200578.028 Feb 2013#85.87.87.8
264John Paul II18 May 192014 Oct 197816 Oct 197858.422 Oct 197858.42 Apr 200584.826.426.4
263John Paul I17 Oct 191225 Aug 197826 Aug 197865.83 Sep 197865.828 Sep 197865.9.0.0
262Paul VI26 Sep 189719 Jun 196321 Jun 196365.730 Jun 196365.76 Aug 197880.815.115.1
261John XXIII25 Nov 188125 Oct 195828 Oct 195876.94 Nov 195876.93 Jun 196381.54.54.5
260Pius XII2 Mar 18761 Mar 19392 Mar 193963.012 Mar 193963.09 Oct 195882.619.619.5
259Pius XI31 May 18572 Feb 19226 Feb 192264.612 Feb 192264.610 Feb 193981.617.016.9
258Benedict XV21 Nov 185431 Aug 19143 Sep 191459.76 Sep 191459.722 Jan 192267.17.37.3
257Pius X2 Jun 183531 Jul 19034 Aug 190368.19 Aug 190368.120 Aug 191479.211.011.0
256Leo XIII2 Mar 181018 Feb 187820 Feb 187867.93 Mar 187868.020 Jul 190393.325.425.3
255Pius IX13 May 179214 Jun 184616 Jun 184654.021 Jun 184654.17 Feb 187885.731.631.6
254Gregory XVI18 Sep 176514 Dec 18302 Feb 183165.36 Feb 1831*65.31 Jun 184680.715.315.3
253Pius VIII20 Nov 176124 Feb 182931 Mar 182967.35 Apr 182967.330 Nov 183069.01.61.6
252Leo XII2 Aug 17602 Sep 182328 Sep 182363.15 Oct 182363.110 Feb 182968.55.35.3
251Pius VII14 Aug 17421 Dec 179914 Mar 180057.521 Mar 180057.620 Aug 182381.023.423.4
250Pius VI25 Dec 17175 Oct 177415 Feb 177557.122 Feb 1775*57.129 Aug 179981.624.524.5
249Clement XIV31 Oct 170515 Feb 176919 May 176963.54 Jun 176963.522 Sep 177468.85.35.2
248Clement XIII7 Mar 169315 May 17586 Jul 175865.316 Jul 175865.32 Feb 176975.910.510.5
247Benedict XIV31 Mar 167518 Feb 174017 Aug 174065.322 Aug 174065.33 May 175883.017.717.6
244Innocent XIII13 May 165531 Mar 17218 May 172165.918 May 172166.07 Mar 172468.82.82.8
246Clement XII7 Apr 16525 Mar 173012 Jul 173078.216 Jul 173078.26 Feb 174087.89.59.5
243Clement XI23 Jul 16499 Oct 170023 Nov 170051.38 Dec 170051.319 Mar 172171.620.320.2
245Benedict XIII2 Feb 164920 Mar 172429 May 172475.34 Jun 172475.323 Feb 173081.05.75.7
242Innocent XII13 Mar 161512 Feb 169112 Jul 169176.315 Jul 169176.327 Sep 170085.59.29.1
240Innocent XI19 May 16112 Aug 167621 Sep 167665.34 Oct 167665.312 Aug 168978.212.812.8
241Alexander VIII22 Apr 161023 Aug 16896 Oct 168979.416 Oct 168979.41 Feb 169180.71.31.2
238Clement IX28 Jan 16002 Jun 166720 Jun 166767.326 Jun 166767.49 Dec 166969.82.42.4
237Alexander VII13 Feb 159918 Jan 16557 Apr 165556.118 Apr 165556.122 May 166768.212.112.0
239Clement X13 Jul 159020 Dec 166929 Apr 167079.711 May 167079.822 Jul 167686.06.26.1
236Innocent X6 May 15749 Aug 164415 Sep 164470.34 Oct 164470.47 Jan 165580.610.310.2
235Urban VIII5 Apr 156819 Jul 16236 Aug 162355.329 Sep 162355.429 Jul 164476.320.920.8
234Gregory XV9 Jan 15548 Feb 16219 Feb 162167.014 Feb 162167.08 Jul 162369.42.42.4
233Paul V17 Sep 15528 May 160516 May 160552.629 May 160552.628 Jan 162168.315.615.6
231Clement VIII24 Feb 153610 Jan 159230 Jan 159255.99 Feb 159255.93 Mar 160569.013.013.0
232Leo XI2 Jun 153514 Mar 16051 Apr 160569.810 Apr 160569.827 Apr 160569.9.0-.0
229Gregory XIV11 Feb 15358 Oct 15905 Dec 159055.88 Dec 159055.816 Oct 159156.6.8.8
227Sixtus V13 Dec 152121 Apr 158524 Apr 158563.31 May 158563.327 Aug 159068.75.35.3
228Urban VII4 Aug 15217 Sep 159015 Sep 159069.1N/AN/A27 Sep 159069.1-.0N/A
230Innocent IX20 Jul 151927 Oct 159129 Oct 159172.23 Nov 159172.230 Dec 159172.4.1.1
225Pius V17 Jan 150420 Dec 15657 Jan 156661.917 Jan 156662.01 May 157268.26.36.2
226Gregory XIII7 Jan 150212 May 157213 May 157270.325 May 157270.310 Apr 158583.212.912.8
222Marcellus II6 May 15015 Apr 15559 Apr 155553.910 Apr 1555*53.91 May 155553.9.0.0
224Pius IV31 Mar 14995 Sep 155925 Dec 155960.76 Jan 156060.79 Dec 156566.65.95.9
221Julius III10 Sep 148729 Nov 15497 Feb 155062.422 Feb 155062.423 Mar 155567.55.15.0
219Clement VII26 May 14781 Oct 152319 Nov 152345.426 Nov 152345.525 Sep 153456.310.810.8
223Paul IV28 Jun 147615 May 155523 May 155578.926 May 155578.918 Aug 155983.14.24.2
217Leo X11 Dec 14754 Mar 15139 Mar 151337.219 Mar 151337.21 Dec 152145.98.78.7
220Paul III29 Feb 146811 Oct 153413 Oct 153466.63 Nov 153466.610 Nov 154981.615.015.0
218Hadrian VI2 Mar 145927 Dec 15219 Jan 152262.831 Aug 152263.414 Sep 152364.51.61.0
216Julius II5 Dec 144331 Oct 15031 Nov 150359.926 Nov 150359.921 Feb 151369.29.39.2
215Pius III29 May 143916 Sep 150322 Sep 150364.38 Oct 150364.318 Oct 150364.3.0-.0
213Innocent VIII 143226 Aug 148429 Aug 148452.612 Sep 148452.625 Jul 149260.57.97.8
214Alexander VI 14316 Aug 149211 Aug 149261.626 Aug 149261.618 Aug 150372.611.010.9
211Paul II23 Feb 141727 Aug 146430 Aug 146447.516 Sep 146447.526 Jul 147154.46.96.8
212Sixtus IV21 Jul 14146 Aug 14719 Aug 147157.025 Aug 1471*57.012 Aug 148470.013.012.9
210Pius II18 Oct 140516 Aug 145819 Aug 145852.83 Sep 145852.814 Aug 146458.85.95.9
208Nicholas V15 Nov 13974 Mar 14476 Mar 144749.319 Mar 144749.324 Mar 145557.38.08.0
207Eugene IV 13832 Mar 14313 Mar 143148.111 Mar 143148.123 Feb 144764.115.915.9
209Callistus III31 Dec 13784 Apr 14558 Apr 145576.220 Apr 145576.36 Aug 145879.53.33.2
206Martin V 13688 Nov 141711 Nov 141749.821 Nov 141749.820 Feb 143163.113.213.2
203Boniface IX 13502 Nov 138939.89 Nov 1389*39.81 Oct 140454.714.914.8
204Innocent VII 133610 Oct 140417 Oct 140468.711 Nov 140468.86 Nov 140670.82.01.9
201Gregory XI 132930 Dec 137041.93 Jan 1371*42.027 Mar 137849.27.27.2
205Gregory XII 132718 Nov 140630 Nov 140679.919 Dec 140679.94 Jul 1415#88.58.58.5
202Urban VI 13188 Apr 137860.218 Apr 137860.215 Oct 138971.711.511.4
200Urban V 131028 Sep 136252.76 Nov 1362*52.819 Dec 137060.98.28.1
198Clement VI 12907 May 134252.319 May 1342*52.36 Dec 135262.910.510.5
199Innocent VI 128218 Dec 135270.930 Dec 135270.912 Sep 136280.69.79.7
197Benedict XII 128020 Dec 133454.98 Jan 133555.025 Apr 134262.37.37.2
195Clement V 12645 Jun 130541.414 Nov 1305*41.820 Apr 131450.38.88.4
196John XXII 12447 Aug 131672.55 Sep 131672.64 Dec 133490.918.318.2
194Benedict XI 124022 Oct 130363.827 Oct 130363.87 Jul 130464.5.7.6
193Boniface VIII 123024 Dec 129464.923 Jan 1295*65.011 Oct 130373.78.78.7
191Nicholas IV30 Sep 122722 Feb 128860.325 Feb 128860.44 Apr 129264.54.14.1
185Innocent V 122421 Jan 127652.022 Feb 127652.122 Jun 127652.4.4.3
192Celestine V 12157 Jul 129479.529 Aug 1294*79.613 Dec 1294#79.9.4.2
184Gregory X 12101 Sep 127161.627 Mar 1272*62.210 Jan 127666.04.33.7
190Honorius IV 12102 Apr 128575.220 May 1285*75.33 Apr 128777.22.01.8
188Nicholas III 121025 Nov 127767.8Dec 1277*67.922 Aug 128070.62.72.7
187John XXI 12108 Sep 127666.620 Sep 127666.720 May 127767.3.6.6
186Hadrian V 121011 Jul 127666.5N/AN/A18 Aug 127666.6.1N/A
189Martin IV 121022 Feb 128171.123 Mar 1281*71.228 Mar 128575.24.04.0
182Urban IV 119529 Aug 126166.6N/AN/A2 Oct 126469.73.0N/A
183Clement IV 11955 Feb 126570.022 Feb 126570.129 Nov 126873.93.83.7
180Innocent IV 119525 Jun 124348.428 Jun 1243*48.47 Dec 125459.911.411.4
181Alexander IV 118512 Dec 125469.920 Dec 125469.925 May 126176.36.46.4
179Celestine IV 118025 Oct 124161.8N/AN/A10 Nov 124161.8-.0N/A
178Gregory IX 117019 Mar 122757.211 Apr 122757.222 Aug 124171.614.414.3
176Innocent III 11608 Jan 119838.022 Feb 1198*38.116 Jul 121656.518.518.4
177Honorius III 115018 Jul 121666.524 Jul 1216*66.518 Mar 122777.210.610.6
174Clement III 113019 Dec 118757.97 Jan 118858.027 Mar 119161.23.23.2
172Urban III 112025 Nov 118565.81 Dec 118565.920 Oct 118767.81.91.8
173Gregory VIII 110521 Oct 118782.825 Oct 1187*82.817 Dec 118782.9.1.1
175Celestine III 110510 Apr 119186.214 Apr 1191*86.28 Jan 119893.06.76.7
169Hadrian IV 11004 Dec 115454.95 Dec 115454.91 Sep 115959.64.74.7
170Alexander III 11007 Sep 115959.620 Sep 1159*59.730 Aug 118181.621.921.9
171Lucius III 11001 Sep 118181.66 Sep 118181.625 Nov 118585.84.24.2
166Lucius II 10959 Mar 114449.112 Mar 1144*49.115 Feb 114550.1.9.9
167Eugene III 108515 Feb 114560.118 Dec 1145*60.98 Jul 115368.58.37.5
165Celestine II 108526 Sep 114358.73 Oct 1143*58.78 Mar 114459.1.4.4
164Innocent II 108214 Feb 113048.123 Feb 1130*48.124 Sep 114361.713.613.5
168Anastasius IV 10738 Jul 115380.512 Jul 115380.53 Dec 115481.91.41.3
161Gelasius II 106224 Jan 111856.010 Mar 1118*56.129 Jan 111957.01.0.8
163Honorius II9 Feb 106015 Dec 112464.821 Dec 112464.813 Feb 113070.05.15.1
160Paschal II 105013 Aug 109949.614 Aug 1099*49.621 Jan 111868.018.418.4
159Urban II 103512 Mar 108853.112 Mar 108853.129 Jul 109964.511.311.3
158Victor III 102624 May 108660.39 May 1087*61.316 Sep 108761.71.3.3
154Stephen IX (X) 10202 Aug 105737.53 Aug 1057*37.529 Mar 105838.2.6.6
157Gregory VII 102022 Apr 107353.329 Jun 1073*53.425 May 108565.312.011.9
153Victor II 1018Sep 105436.613 Apr 105537.228 Jul 105739.52.92.2
156Alexander II 101830 Sep 106143.71 Oct 106143.721 Apr 107355.311.511.5
145Benedict IX 1010 103222.0N/AN/ASep 1044#34.612.6N/A
149Clement II 100524 Dec 104641.925 Dec 104641.99 Oct 104742.7.7.7
152Leo IX21 Jun 100212 Feb 104946.6N/AN/A19 Apr 105451.85.1N/A
151Damasus II 100017 Jul 104848.5N/AN/A9 Aug 104848.6.0N/A
148Gregory VI 10005 May 104545.35 May 104545.323 Dec 1046#46.91.61.6
146Sylvester III 100013 Jan 104545.0N/AN/A10 Mar 1045#45.1.1N/A
143Benedict VIII 98018 May 101232.3N/AN/A9 Apr 102444.211.8N/A
155Nicholas II 9806 Dec 105878.924 Jan 105979.027 Jul 106181.52.62.5
144John XIX 97519 Apr 102449.2Jul 1024*49.5 103257.07.77.5
142Sergius IV 97031 Jul 100939.5Jul 1010*40.512 May 101242.32.71.8
138Gregory V 970N/AN/A3 May 99626.34 Feb 99929.0N/A2.7
139Sylvester II 94528 Feb 99954.12 Apr 99954.212 May 100358.34.24.1
130John XII 93716 Dec 95518.9N/AN/A14 May 96427.38.4N/A
131Leo VIII 9156 Dec 96348.9N/AN/A1 Mar 96550.11.2N/A
132Benedict V 91522 May 96449.3N/AN/A4 Jul 96651.52.1N/A
125John XI 901Mar 93130.1N/AN/AJan 93635.04.8N/A
121Lando 8657 Jul 91348.5N/AN/A5 Feb 91449.0.5N/A
120Anastasius III 86514 Apr 91146.2N/AN/AJun 91348.42.1N/A
119Sergius III 86029 Jan 90444.0N/AN/A14 Apr 91151.27.2N/A
122John X 860Mar 91454.115 May 914*54.32 Jul 92969.515.315.1
113Stephen VI 85022 May 89646.3N/AN/A14 Aug 89747.61.2N/A
114Romanus 85014 Aug 89747.6N/AN/ANov 89747.8.2N/A
118Leo V 84530 Jul 90358.5N/AN/ADec 90358.9.3N/A
115Theodore II 840Dec 89757.9N/AN/A20 Dec 89757.9.0N/A
110Stephen V 84014 Sep 88545.7N/AN/A4 Sep 89151.65.9N/A
116John IX 84018 Jan 89858.0N/AN/A5 Jan 90060.01.9N/A
117Benedict IV 8401 Feb 90060.0N/AN/A30 Jul 90363.53.4N/A
108Marinus I 83016 Dec 88252.9N/AN/A15 May 88454.31.4N/A
109Hadrian III 83017 May 88454.3N/AN/A15 Sep 88555.71.3N/A
107John VIII 82014 Dec 87252.9N/AN/A16 Dec 88262.910.0N/A
111Formosus 8166 Oct 89175.7N/AN/A4 Apr 89680.24.4N/A
104Benedict III 81026 Jul 85545.529 Sep 855*45.77 Apr 85848.22.62.5
112Boniface VI 80611 Apr 89690.2N/AN/A26 Apr 89690.3-.0N/A
105Nicholas I 800Apr 85858.224 Apr 858*58.313 Nov 86767.89.69.5
106Hadrian II 79213 Nov 86775.814 Dec 867*75.914 Dec 87280.95.05.0
102Sergius II 79025 Jan 84454.0N/AN/A27 Jan 84757.03.0N/A
103Leo IV 79027 Jan 84757.010 Apr 847*57.217 Jul 85565.58.48.2
101Gregory IV 79020 Dec 82737.929 Mar 828*38.225 Jan 84454.016.015.8
100Valentine 78031 Aug 82747.6N/AN/A10 Oct 82747.7.1N/A
99Eugene II 7808 May 82444.36 Jun 824*44.427 Aug 82747.63.33.2
98Paschal I 77525 Jan 81742.026 Jan 817*42.011 Feb 82449.17.07.0
97Stephen IV 770Jun 81646.422 Jun 816*46.424 Jan 81747.0.6.5
96Leo III 75026 Dec 79545.927 Dec 795*45.912 Jun 81666.420.420.4
94Stephen III 7201 Aug 76848.57 Aug 768*48.524 Jan 77252.03.43.4
92Stephen II 71429 May 75238.4N/AN/A26 Apr 75743.34.9N/A
93Paul 70029 Apr 75757.3N/AN/A28 Jun 76767.410.1N/A
91Zacharias 6793 Dec 74162.910 Dec 741*62.915 Mar 75273.210.210.2
90Gregory III 669Mar 73162.118 Mar 731*62.228 Nov 74172.910.710.6
89Gregory II 669May 71546.319 May 715*46.311 Feb 73162.115.715.7
88Constantine 66425 Mar 70844.2N/AN/A9 Apr 71551.27.0N/A
86John VII 655N/AN/A1 Mar 705*50.118 Oct 70752.7N/A2.6
87Sisinius 650Oct 70757.715 Jan 708*58.04 Feb 70858.0.3.0
84Sergius I 650 68737.015 Dec 687*37.97 Sep 70151.614.613.7
85John VI 650N/AN/A30 Oct 701*51.811 Jan 70555.0N/A3.1
82John V 635N/AN/A23 Jul 685*50.52 Aug 68651.5N/A1.0
81Benedict II 635N/AN/A26 Jun 684*49.48 May 68550.3N/A.8
83Conon 630 68656.023 Oct 686*56.821 Sep 68757.71.7.9
77Adeodatus II 621 67251.011 Apr 672*51.216 Jun 67655.44.44.1
75Eugene I 615N/AN/A10 Aug 654*39.62 Jun 65742.4N/A2.8
80Leo II 611N/AN/A17 Aug 682*71.63 Jul 68372.5N/A.8
73Theodore I 61012 Oct 64232.724 Nov 642*32.814 May 64939.36.56.4
78Donus 610 67666.02 Nov 676*66.811 Apr 67868.22.21.4
76Vitalian 600May 65757.330 Jul 657*57.527 Jan 67272.014.714.4
74Martin I 590 64959.05 Jul 649*59.516 Sep 65565.76.76.1
72John IV 587Aug 64053.524 Dec 640*53.912 Oct 64255.72.11.8
71Severinus 58515 Oct 63853.728 May 640*55.42 Aug 64055.51.7.1
70Honorius I 585Oct 62540.727 Oct 625*40.812 Oct 63853.713.012.9
79Agatho 577N/AN/A27 Jun 678*101.410 Jan 681104.0N/A2.5
69Boniface V 575Nov 61843.823 Dec 619*44.923 Oct 62550.86.95.8
68Adeodatus I 570 61545.013 Nov 615*45.88 Nov 61848.83.82.9
67Boniface IV 550 60858.015 Sep 608*58.78 May 61565.37.36.6
66Boniface III 540 60767.019 Feb 607*67.112 Nov 60767.8.8.7
65Sabinian 530 60474.013 Sep 604*74.622 Feb 60676.12.11.4
62Benedict I 525 57550.02 Jun 575*50.430 Jul 57954.54.54.1
63Pelagius II 520 57959.026 Nov 579*59.97 Feb 59070.011.010.1
61John III 520 56141.017 Jul 561*41.513 Jul 57454.513.512.9
60Pelagius I 505 55651.016 Apr 556*51.24 Mar 56156.15.14.8
59Vigilius 500Mar 53737.129 Mar 537*37.27 Jun 55555.418.218.1
58Silverius 480May 53656.38 Jun 536*56.4Jun 53757.41.0.9
124Stephen VIIunknownJan 929N/AN/AFeb 9312.0N/A
127Stephen VIIIunknown14 Jul 93919 Jul 939Oct 9423.23.2
140John XVIIunknown16 May 1003N/AN/A6 Nov 1003.4N/A
128Marinus IIunknown30 Oct 94211 Nov 942*May 9463.53.4
123Leo VIunknownJun 928N/AN/ADec 928.5N/A
126Leo VIIunknown3 Jan 936N/AN/A13 Jul 9393.5N/A
64Gregory IunknownSep 5903 Sep 590*12 Mar 60413.513.5
137John XVunknownAug 985Sep 985*Mar 99610.510.5
133John XIIIunknown1 Oct 965N/AN/A6 Sep 9726.9N/A
141John XVIIIunknown25 Dec 100325 Dec 1003*Jun 10095.45.4
136John XIVunknownDec 983N/AN/A20 Aug 984.7N/A
162Callistus IIunknown2 Feb 11199 Feb 111913 Dec 11245.85.8
134Benedict VIunknown20 Dec 97219 Jan 973*Jul 9741.51.4
135Benedict VIIunknownOct 974N/AN/A10 Jul 9838.7N/A
129Agapitus IIunknown 94610 May 946*15 Dec 9559.99.5
57Agapitus Iunknown13 May 535N/AN/A22 Apr 536.9N/A
95Hadrian Iunknown1 Feb 7729 Feb 772*25 Dec 79523.823.8
Note: The above table is substantially incomplete at this time.
* indicates the Pope was not already a bishop at the time of his election, so the date is of his consecration.
# indicates the Pope resigned.
Popes listed: 208. This table was last updated on 20 May 2018.

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 20 May 2018

Quantcast