Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Sylvester II

Gerbert , O.S.B. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
945¹Born
991²46.0AppointedArchbishop of Reims, France
998²53.0Elevated to Cardinal
Apr 998²53.2AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
28 Feb 99954.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Apr 99954.2InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 May 100358.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerbert (VIAF: 264422706)
Pope Gerbert O.S.B. (born 945, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelliac, France
Death PlaceS. Croce in Gerusalemme, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Vatican, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)St. John Lateran, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 1.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 998

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Mar 2017