Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius IV

Giovanni Angelo de’ Medici

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1499Born
14 Dec 154546.7AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
20 Apr 154647.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
8 Apr 154950.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 May 154950.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1 Sep 155051.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
23 Mar 155252.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
1 Mar 155353.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
11 Dec 155354.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
30 May 155556.1AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
25 Jun 155657.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Foligno, Italy
7 May 155758.1ResignedBishop of Foligno, Italy
Sep 1557²58.4ResignedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
20 Sep 155758.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
20 Jul 155859.3AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
25 Dec 155960.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
6 Jan 156060.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Dec 156566.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Angelo de’ Medici (VIAF: 76309925)
Pope Giovanni Angelo de’ Medici (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria degli Angeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 19.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.7 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Apr 1549
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 156, and Page 199
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 281, and Page 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 14 Oct 2017