Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent VIII

Giovanni Battista Cib˛

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1432²BornGenova
5 Nov 146634.8AppointedBishop of Savona, Italy
28 Jan 146735.1Ordained BishopBishop of Savona, Italy
25 Apr 146735.3InstalledBishop of Savona, Italy
16 Sep 147240.7AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
7 May 147341.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 147341.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
Jan 1474³42.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
29 Aug 148452.7ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Sep 148452.7InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
25 Jul 149260.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Cib˛:
Holy Father Giovanni Battista Cib˛ (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
  • a cardinal for 11.3 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 229, and Page 189
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 May 1473
  • ob/i: CB, 7 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014