Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement IX

Giulio Rospigliosi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1600BornPistoria
14 Mar 164444.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
29 Mar 164444.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
14 Jul 164444.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Jan 1653³52.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Apr 1655³55.1AppointedSecretary of State
9 Apr 165757.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165757.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
22 May 166767.3ResignedSecretary of State
20 Jun 166767.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
26 Jun 166767.4InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
9 Dec 166969.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Rospigliosi:
Pope Giulio Rospigliosi (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 108, Number 657
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015