Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Pius III

Francesco Todeschini-Piccolomini

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1439Born
6 Feb 146020.6AppointedAdministrator of Siena, Italy
5 Mar 146020.7Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 146020.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
21 Feb 148545.7AppointedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
26 May 149454.9ResignedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
31 Oct 149556.4AppointedAdministrator of Pienza e Montalcino, Italy
149656.5AppointedAdministrator of Fermo, Italy
Mar 149858.7ResignedAdministrator of Pienza e Montalcino, Italy
22 Sep 150364.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Sep 150364.3Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Oct 150364.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Oct 150364.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Oct 150364.3DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Francesco Todeschini-Piccolomini (VIAF: 44290886)
Pope Francesco Todeschini-Piccolomini (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for .0 years
  • a bishop for -.0 years
  • a cardinal for 43.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for -.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1503, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 216

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast