Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope John Paul I

Albino Luciani

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


from the web site of the diocese

from the web site of the diocese

Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1912Born
2 Feb 193522.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
7 Jul 193522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
15 Dec 195846.1AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
27 Dec 195846.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
11 Jan 195946.2InstalledBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
15 Dec 196957.1AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Feb 197057.3InstalledPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Mar 197360.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197360.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
26 Aug 197865.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Sep 197865.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Sep 197865.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Albino Luciani (VIAF: 100900297)
Pope Albino Luciani (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForno di Canale, Diocese of Belluno e Feltre
Ordained PriestS. Pietro, Church, Belluno, Diocese of Belluno e Feltre
Ordained BishopS. Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.7 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast