Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XIV

Niccol˛ Sfondrati

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1535Born
13 Mar 156025.0AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
Apr 1564²29.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cremona, Italy
12 Dec 158348.8Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jan 158549.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
5 Dec 159055.8ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Dec 159055.8InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
16 Oct 159156.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Sfondrati (VIAF: 295180128)
Pope Niccol˛ Sfondrati (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomma, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)St. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
  • a cardinal for 6.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1583
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1564, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018