Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XV

Alessandro Ludovisi

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1554BornBologna
2 Apr 161258.2AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
1 May 161258.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
19 Sep 161662.6Elevated to Cardinal
3 Dec 161864.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
9 Feb 162167.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
14 Feb 162167.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Jul 162369.4DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Ludovisi:
Pope Alessandro Ludovisi (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1616
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014