Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedict XVI

Joseph Ratzinger

Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1927 BornMarktl am Inn, Germany
29 Oct 195023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
29 Jun 195124.2Ordained PriestPriest of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
24 Mar 197749.9AppointedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
28 May 197750.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
27 Jun 197750.2Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jun 197750.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino
15 Oct 197750.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Consolatrice al Tiburtino
25 Nov 198154.6AppointedPresident of the International Theological Commission
25 Nov 198154.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
25 Nov 198154.6AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
15 Feb 198254.8ResignedArchbishop of München und Freising {Munich}, Germany
5 Apr 199366.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni
16 May 199366.1InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Velletri-Segni
27 Nov 200275.6ElectedDean of the College of Cardinals
30 Nov 200275.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
30 Nov 200275.6ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
16 Mar 200375.9InstalledCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
2 Apr 200578.0CeasedPresident of the International Theological Commission
2 Apr 200578.0CeasedPrefect of the Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
2 Apr 200578.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
19 Apr 200578.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
24 Apr 200578.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Feb 201385.9ResignedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Joseph Ratzinger: VIAF:102167198
Pope Joseph Ratzinger (born ) Pope Emeritus of Roma {Rome}

Please contact the Pope through the Diocese of Roma {Rome}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for 27.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.8 years (Resigned)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Oct 2014