Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Gregory XI

Pierre Roger de Beaufort

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1329¹BornMaumont
29 May 1348³19.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
29 May 1348³19.4Elevated to Cardinal
30 Dec 137041.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
2 Jan 137142.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jan 137142.0Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
27 Mar 137849.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Roger de Beaufort:
Pope Pierre Roger de Beaufort (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 7.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
  • a cardinal for 22.5 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c12: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 May 1348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014