Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement XI

Giovanni Francesco Albani

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1649BornUrbino
13 Feb 169040.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169040.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
22 May 169040.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
30 Mar 170050.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
Sep 170051.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Silvestro in Capite
23 Nov 170051.3ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
30 Nov 170051.3Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Dec 170051.3InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
19 Mar 172171.6DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Francesco Albani:
Pope Giovanni Francesco Albani (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 20.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014