Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Eugene III

Bl. Bernardo da Pisa, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1085¹BornPisa, France
1135¹50.0Ordained PriestPriest
1138¹53.0ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians
15 Feb 114560.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 Dec 114560.9Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
8 Jul 115368.5DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Dec 1872Beatified

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Bernardo da Pisa:
Pope Bl. Bernardo da Pisa O. Cist. (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
  • a pope for 8.3 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014