Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Anastasius IV

Corrado di Suburra, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1073¹Born
Dec 1127³54.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
Dec 1127³54.9Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jul 115380.5ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
12 Jul 115380.5InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
3 Dec 115481.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Corrado di Suburra
Pope Corrado di Suburra C.R.L. (born 1073, died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 25.6 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 1.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast