Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Clement IV

Gui Foucois

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1195¹BornSanit-Gilles-sur-Rhône, France
1257²62.0SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
19 Oct 125762.7ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
Jan 1258³63.0InstalledBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
10 Oct 125964.7AppointedArchbishop of Narbonne, France
17 Dec 126166.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
17 Dec 126166.9Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 126570.0ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
22 Feb 126570.1InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
29 Nov 126873.9DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gui Foucois:
Pope Gui Foucois (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 3.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 3.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014