Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Martin IV

Simon de Brion

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1210¹BornMainpincien, France
17 Dec 126151.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
17 Dec 126151.9Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 128171.1ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
23 Mar 128171.2Ordained BishopPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
28 Mar 128575.2DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Simon de Brion:
Pope Simon de Brion (died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 4.0 years
  • a cardinal for 19.1 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014