Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Saverio Cardinal de Zelada

Deceased

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1717BornRoma, Italy
23 Oct 174023.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 176649.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
28 Dec 176649.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
19 Apr 177355.6Elevated to Cardinal
26 Apr 177355.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
15 Dec 177962.3AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
Nov 1780³63.1AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
178163.3AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
Oct 1786³69.0ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
8 Sep 178871.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
14 Oct 178972.1AppointedSecretary of State
17 Jun 179375.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
Aug 1796³78.9ResignedSecretary of State
19 Dec 180184.3DiedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio de Zelada
Francesco Saverio Cardinal de Zelada (born , died ) Archivist of Vatican Secret Archives

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
  • a cardinal for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1773
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016