Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo d’Ambrogio

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1730Born
23 Dec 175222.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179161.8SelectedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
27 Feb 179262.0ConfirmedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
4 Mar 179262.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
3 Apr 179969.1DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo d’Ambrogio
Bishop Filippo d’Ambrogio (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1796
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 138
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast