Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Maria Capobianco, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria

Titular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1708BornBrundusin
23 Mar 173224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 Apr 176759.1AppointedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
12 Apr 176759.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
9 Jun 179284.2ResignedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
18 Jun 179284.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
7 Feb 179384.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alberto Maria Capobianco:
Archbishop Alberto Maria Capobianco O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Reggio Calabria

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 174, and Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013