Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloisio Buonamici

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1737BornVolterra
19 Dec 176124.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 177638.4AppointedBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
21 Apr 177638.4Ordained BishopBishop of Colle di Val d’Elsa, Italy
23 Sep 178244.8AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
2 May 179153.4DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aloisio Buonamici:
Bishop Aloisio Buonamici (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 172, and Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013