Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giacomo Onorati

Deceased

Bishop of Troia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1721³BornRocchetta
10 Aug 174524.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Aug 174524.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176847.0AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
31 Jan 176847.0Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
12 May 177756.3AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
6 Mar 179372.1DiedBishop of Troia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Onorati:
Bishop Giovanni Giacomo Onorati (born , died ) Bishop of Troia

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399, and Page 419
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 12 Dec 2015