Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Gregorio Golini

Deceased

Bishop of Trevico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1728BornGiuliano
16 Dec 179163.3SelectedBishop of Trevico, Italy
27 Feb 179263.4ConfirmedBishop of Trevico, Italy
4 Mar 179263.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trevico, Italy
1813¹84.3DiedBishop of Trevico, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agostino Gregorio Golini
Bishop Agostino Gregorio Golini (born , died 1813) Bishop of Trevico

  • a bishop for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1796
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016