Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anselmo Maria Toppi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1725BornMarigliano
16 Apr 174115.3ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jun 179266.5AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
24 Jun 179266.5Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
179973.0DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Anselmo Maria Toppi:
Bishop Anselmo Maria Toppi O.S.B. (born ) Bishop of Termoli

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015