Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Orefici

Deceased

Bishop of Gubbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1721³BornFaenza
17 Apr 174523.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Sep 176846.7AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
2 Oct 176846.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
17 Oct 178462.8DiedBishop of Gubbio, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Orefici:
Bishop Paolo Orefici (born , died ) Bishop of Gubbio

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 211
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1768, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015