Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Angelo Pastrovich, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1710Born
6 Sep 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Dec 177262.1AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
20 Dec 177262.2Ordained BishopBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
4 Apr 178372.5DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Angelo Pastrovich
Bishop Francesco Angelo Pastrovich O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenigallia

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast