Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Maria Castro

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1735³BornGaete
11 Mar 175822.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Jun 175924.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179156.5SelectedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
27 Feb 179256.7ConfirmedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
4 Mar 179256.8Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
24 Oct 179762.4SelectedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
18 Dec 179762.5ConfirmedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
9 Oct 180065.4DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Maria Castro
Bishop Vincenzo Maria Castro (born , died ) Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153, and Page 425
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016