Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Gaetano del Muscio, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manfredonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1746BornFoggia
25 Mar 176923.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
20 Jan 179245.9SelectedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
26 Mar 179246.1ConfirmedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
9 Apr 179246.1Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
24 Oct 179751.7SelectedBishop of San Severo, Italy
18 Dec 179751.8ConfirmedBishop of San Severo, Italy
29 Oct 180458.7AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
Dec 1807³61.8DiedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Gaetano del Muscio
Archbishop Giovanni Gaetano del Muscio Sch. P. (born , died Dec 1807) Archbishop of Manfredonia

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140, and Page 378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 347
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016