Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Vincenzo Tortora

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1739BornNocera Pagani
27 Mar 176222.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179152.5SelectedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
27 Feb 179252.7ConfirmedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
4 Mar 179252.7Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
26 Aug 181475.2DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Vincenzo Tortora
Bishop Gennaro Vincenzo Tortora (born , died ) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016