Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambenedetto (Angelo) Falier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ceneda, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1738Born
19 Sep 176122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Sep 179253.9AppointedBishop of Ceneda, Italy
30 Sep 179253.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ceneda, Italy
22 Oct 182183.0DiedBishop of Ceneda, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giambenedetto (Angelo) Falier
Bishop Giambenedetto (Angelo) Falier O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ceneda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenise

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast