Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Felice de’ Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Terni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1722Born
24 Sep 174624.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176845.4AppointedBishop of Terni, Italy
31 Jan 176845.4Ordained BishopBishop of Terni, Italy
24 Sep 178866.0DiedBishop of Terni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Felice de’ Rossi
Bishop Agostino Felice de’ Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Terni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Giorgio

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,768, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast