Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo d’Aprile

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1732BornGallipoli
24 May 175523.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 177745.2AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
24 Jun 177745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
16 Dec 179159.7SelectedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
27 Feb 179259.9ConfirmedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
Apr 181179.0DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo d’Aprile:
Bishop Filippo d’Aprile (born , died Apr 1811) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1808
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 285, and Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015