Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Tosti

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1724Born
15 May 174722.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 177651.5AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
4 Feb 177651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
178156.4DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Tosti
Bishop Raffaele Tosti (born , died 1781) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMola

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 221
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast