Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Trasmondi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1726Born
10 Nov 174922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
15 Feb 179265.2SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
18 Jun 179265.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
24 Jun 179265.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
1804²77.0DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Trasmondi
Archbishop Luigi Trasmondi O.S.B. (born , died 1804) Archbishop of Trani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSulmona

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 412
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast