Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gioacchino Paglione

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1723Born
13 Dec 175027.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 177148.5AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
29 Sep 177148.5Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
Dec 1790³67.6DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gioacchino Paglione
Bishop Gioacchino Paglione (born , died Dec 1790) Bishop of Trivento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittarelle

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 418
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast