Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Notariis

Deceased

Bishop of Squillace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1727BornSanta Caterina
25 Aug 175225.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 177750.0AppointedBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
3 Aug 177750.0Ordained BishopBishop of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
20 Jul 177851.0AppointedBishop of Squillace, Italy
8 Jul 180275.0DiedBishop of Squillace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Notariis:
Bishop Nicolas Notariis (born , died ) Bishop of Squillace

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795, Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1777, Number 18
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 386, and Page 425

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015