Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Martini

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ Ducale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1736BornSan Bartolomeo di Galdo
27 Dec 175923.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179255.2SelectedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
18 Jun 179255.6ConfirmedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
24 Jun 179255.6Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy
179861.1DiedBishop of CittÓ Ducale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Martini
Bishop Pasquale Martini (born , died 1798) Bishop of CittÓ Ducale

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795, Page 77
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 168
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1792, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016